CO SB117 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consistent procedures between schools and county departments of human services relating to students in out-of-home placement.
Title
Foster Care Student Services Coordination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-117 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-117 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-117 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-117 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |