CO SB115 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Recording Technology Board
Title
Electronic Recording Technology Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on The motion passed on a vote of 9-2. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on The motion passed on a vote of 9-2. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-115, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance |
2016-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |