CO SB115 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Medical Marijuana Programs
Title
Sunset Medical Marijuana Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Owen Hill [R] | Rep. Daniel Pabon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend reengrossed bill as the basis of the conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft conference committee report CLSB115.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.027 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment K). This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.013 (Attachment U) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment P) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment Q) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment R) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment T) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment S) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment M) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft conference committee report CLSB115.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.027 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment K). This motion was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.013 (Attachment U) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment P) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment Q) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment R) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment T) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment S) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment M) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-05-05 | Senate | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-05-05 | Senate | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-16 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |