CO SB112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a clarification of the effect of statutes of limitations on the dispute resolution process when a taxpayer owes sales or use tax to one local government but has erroneously paid the disputed tax to another local government.
Title
Sales & Use Tax Payment To Wrong Local Government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |