CO SB109 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an authorization for notaries public to perform notarial acts using audio-video communication, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Authorize Audio-video Communication Notarial Acts
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Alec Garnett [D] | Rep. Cole Wist [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House Appropriations: Postpone Senate Bill 18-109 indefinitely. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Finance: Substitute motion to lay over Senate Bill 18-109 to Thursday, May 10, which has the effect of postponing the bill indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 18-109 indefinitely. (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-109 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-109 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Finance: Substitute motion to lay over Senate Bill 18-109 to Thursday, May 10, which has the effect of postponing the bill indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 18-109 indefinitely. (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-109 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-109 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |