CO SB109 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mandatory Abuse Report For Adult With A Disability

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory Abuse Report For Adult With A Disability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-109 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 with change to identify Human Services (not CDPHE) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-14SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-14SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2015-04-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2015-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-14SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-10SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-02-25SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-02-11SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2015-01-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109shhsapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E12A97A15F59EB1F87257DCC00575005/$FILE/109_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/533D7B5A1B035F8787257DF70067FAEB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8E75FEED4D5227C087257DF70067F608
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5E19CAAF2959969387257DF70067E935
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/294E4A159D7D6E2887257E230050192C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/28AB9F3D4488190387257E2300503E5E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E8D747DA9354CF5D87257E3500646604
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2CEDE0B223AAACFF87257E3600527302
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C0265D3FB21D815A87257E3500643F9B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1E0587E89064E3A187257E3500644A65

Bill Comments

feedback