CO SB108 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to improve outcomes for youth in the juvenile justice system, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.021) (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-108 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 19-108 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.021) (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-108 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 19-108 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |