CO SB108 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the issuance of identification documents under the "Colorado Road and Community Safety Act" to persons who are not lawfully present in the United States, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Eligibility Colorado Road And Community Safety Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Recede (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Repass (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 18-108 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Repass (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 18-108 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-108, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Adherence - Result was to Recede |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere |
2018-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |