CO SB108 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset ID Theft Fraud Unit
Title
Sunset ID Theft Fraud Unit
Sponsors
Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Rep. Libby Szabo [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Committee 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Committee 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Committee 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Committee 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Committee 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Committee 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-108 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-25 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-04-19 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-24 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |