CO SB106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an additional process by which a board of county commissioners may initiate the withdrawal of current employees who are peace officers from a defined contribution retirement plan offered by one or more local governments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Withdraw Peace Officers Local Government Retirement Plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2019-04-05HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2019-04-01 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
2019-02-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-15SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-106
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_106_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_106_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_106_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_106_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_106_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e3dd0fa692dc4d18725839f0073dab9-sb19-106-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e3dd0fa692dc4d18725839f0073dab9-sb19-106-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e3dd0fa692dc4d18725839f0073dab9-sb19-106-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e3dd0fa692dc4d18725839f0073dab9-sb19-106-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-106vote5e72a1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f5d57125bc8d90dc872583bb0058988e-sb19-106-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f5d57125bc8d90dc872583bb0058988e-sb19-106-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f5d57125bc8d90dc872583bb0058988e-sb19-106-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-106vote577bff
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-106vote01ef5b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-106vote5bd57e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-106vote625255
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-106vote623fc8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-106vote56f399
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-106vote57002b

Bill Comments

feedback