CO SB106 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Food Systems Advisory Council
Title
Food Systems Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-106, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-106, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-106, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-106, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-05 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-29 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-28 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-27 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-23 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-07 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations |