CO SB105 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the implementation of measures to ensure equal pay for equal work, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Ensure Equal Pay For Equal Work
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-105 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-105, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-105 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-105, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-24 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |