CO SB104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Incentives To Build Number Of Rural Teachers
Title
Incentives To Build Number Of Rural Teachers
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Rep. Jon Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-09 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |