CO SB102 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Forester Prescribed Fire Cert Stnd
Title
State Forester Prescribed Fire Cert Stnd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-102 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-102 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-102 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-07 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-03-16 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-15 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources |