CO SB101 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the registration of direct-entry midwives, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2020 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies and making an appropriation.
Title
Sunset Direct-entry Midwives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-101 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-101 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-101, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment K). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-101, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-101 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-101 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-101, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment K). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-101, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |