CO SB100 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rule Review Bill
Title
Rule Review Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-100 to the House Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - To refer Senate Bill 15-100 to the Committee of the Whole in the Senate with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - A conceptual amendment to add two new sections to SB15-100l, one of which would specify that Rule 7.000.3 of the State Board of Human Services is repealed and the other section would give that prior new section an effective date of upon passa (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-100 to the Senate Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - To refer Senate Bill 15-100 to the Committee of the Whole in the Senate with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - A conceptual amendment to add two new sections to SB15-100l, one of which would specify that Rule 7.000.3 of the State Board of Human Services is repealed and the other section would give that prior new section an effective date of upon passa (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-100 to the Senate Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | House Committee on Legal Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Legal Services |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Re-referred to Legal Services - No Amendments |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legal Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legal Services |