CO SB099 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the assistance program for disability benefits under the "Laura Hershey Disability Support Act", and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendation contained in the 2020 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset License Plate Disability Support Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-099 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-099 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-099 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-099 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-099 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-099 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |