CO SB099 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the "Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act (2015)", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act 2015

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-099 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-099 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-099, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-099, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-099, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-099, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Vetoed
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-26SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-25SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2019-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-08SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-19SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-099
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_099_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_099_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_099_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_099_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_099_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_099_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4497157a67033d058725839900754b31-sb19-099-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4497157a67033d058725839900754b31-sb19-099-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/727f9e64c818e6ca872583a6007d4708-sb19-099-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/727f9e64c818e6ca872583a6007d4708-sb19-099-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d53dd6fb5f969f08872583b700513f94-sb19-099-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d53dd6fb5f969f08872583b700513f94-sb19-099-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-099vote61c60b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4af7a21cfed251f7872583d800713505-sb19-099-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4af7a21cfed251f7872583d800713505-sb19-099-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ec71a80fd443f31b872583e00001b289-sb19-099-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9fff2cbc57d2782a872583e5004e2fa2-sb19-099-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-099vote652a0a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-099vote0244cb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-099vote0258f9

Bill Comments

feedback