CO SB096 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an authorization for notaries public to perform notarial acts using audio-video communication, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote Notaries Protect Privacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 20-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26 Governor Signed
2020-06-22 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-09SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-03-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2020-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-03-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-096
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_096_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_096_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_096_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_096_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_096_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_096_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9a3b242be0b239878725850c0074eb5f-sb20-096-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ee45cbeec5d6a46872585230053b6d3-sb20-096-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ee45cbeec5d6a46872585230053b6d3-sb20-096-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-096vote582d10
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9a3b242be0b239878725850c0074eb5f-sb20-096-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d82e638bc7b2dd8872585750075487a-sb20-096-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e8c1f71c1d62b8e8725857c00627c00-sb20-096-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4e8c1f71c1d62b8e8725857c00627c00-sb20-096-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-096vote5e1250
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-096vote5de642
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-096vote5dbb54

Bill Comments

feedback