CO SB093 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning protections related to mandatory agreement provisions, and, in connection therewith, enacting the "Consumer and Employee Dispute Resolution Fairness Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer And Employee Dispute Resolution Fairness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-04 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 20-093 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.052) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.053) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Lay Over (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Amendment L. 004 (Attachment D) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseHouse Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
2020-05-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2020-03-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-03-05SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/09/2020 - No Amendments
2020-02-07SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-06SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-03SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-093
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_093_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_093_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_093_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b0129225aabc112872584fe0071e0bc-sb20-093-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b0129225aabc112872584fe0071e0bc-sb20-093-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b0129225aabc112872584fe0071e0bc-sb20-093-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b0129225aabc112872584fe0071e0bc-sb20-093-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-093vote5b7b05
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-093vote5cd199
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-093vote59e472
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-093vote599deb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4fb1b9909138fd48725857d007a10fd-sb20-093-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback