CO SB093 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of obsolete provisions in the Colorado medical assistance program relating to the inactive home- and community-based services waiver for persons living with AIDS.
Title
Repeal Obsolete Medicaid Waiver Persons With AIDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-093 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-093 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |