CO SB093 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Compensate Owners Min Interests Extraction Regs
Title
Compensate Owners Min Interests Extraction Regs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-093 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-093 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-093 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-093 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-093 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |