CO SB090 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
concerning "rights of married women".
Title
Terminology Referencing "Rights Of Married Women"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-090 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-090 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |