CO SB090 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Temporary Registration Document Standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary Registration Document Standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-090 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-090, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-090, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-090, as amended, to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-14SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-14SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-06SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-05SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2015-05-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2015-05-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-05-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
2015-03-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations
2015-03-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-03-17SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-02-10SenateSenate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Finance
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090stra_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090strafin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090strafinapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090te_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B0C1DF2EE206661187257DA20061AA68/$FILE/090_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/509F2BA30D4E62A287257DE8007581E3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/59BACBDB5E561E3487257DEA00653B60
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/98586951F341CAE687257DEA00652B15
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/87082922AD480FA287257DE80073E1B1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/798D0BE2869FA95E87257E07004D5D38
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/04D9777D781FA75F87257E07004D65A4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/17A86CA09C7300F787257E1B005D6A89
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F11F02934FAE1DEB87257E1B005D539C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/19ECB52DB30EC30B87257E37000ACC9C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B9D7CA80A645F14187257E3C00017120
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6C59527FB1F109E387257E3C000179B6

Bill Comments

feedback