CO SB089 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding assistance to increase the minimum amounts paid to persons employed by local education providers.
Title
Educator Pay Raise Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |