CO SB087 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning in-state tuition at institutions of higher education for certain foreign nationals legally settled in Colorado.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-state Tuition Foreign Nationals Settled In Colorado

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-087 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-087 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12 Governor Signed
2018-04-09 Sent to the Governor
2018-04-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-04-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-28HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-26HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2018-02-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-05SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-087
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_087_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_087_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_087_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_087_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_087_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_087_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-02-05t133207z-sb18-087-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-087vote5a1dda
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hed2018a2018-03-21t104608z-sb18-087-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-087vote5a07ba
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hed2018a2018-03-21t104608z-sb18-087-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback