CO SB087 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Exemption Tiered Rate Plan
Title
Medical Exemption Tiered Rate Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-087 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-21 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-18 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-15 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |