CO SB086 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Study Cost Of Regulatory Compliance
Title
Study Cost Of Regulatory Compliance
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cadman [R] | Rep. Libby Szabo [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Prioritize Senate Bill 12-086 as an interim committee staffed by legislative staff (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Prioritize Senate Bill 12-086 as an interim committee staffed by legislative staff (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). The chair ruled the amendment does not fit under the title. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on to Legislative Council (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). The chair ruled the amendment does not fit under the title. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on to Legislative Council (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Prioritize Senate Bill 12-086 as an interim committee staffed by legislative staff (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Prioritize Senate Bill 12-086 as an interim committee staffed by legislative staff (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). The chair ruled the amendment does not fit under the title. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on to Legislative Council (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). The chair ruled the amendment does not fit under the title. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on to Legislative Council (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-05-03 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Unamended to Legislative Council | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |