CO SB085 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creating the Colorado safe student protection program.
Title
Colorado Safe Student Protection Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 22-085 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-085, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-085, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |