CO SB083 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of income tax credits for nonpublic education, and, in connection therewith, reducing an appropriation.
Title
Education Income Tax Credits For Nonpublic School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House Education: Postpone Senate Bill 18-083 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Education: Postpone Senate Bill 18-083 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-083 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Education: Postpone Senate Bill 18-083 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-083 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |