CO SB082 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a physician's right to provide continuing care to patients with rare disorders despite a covenant not to compete.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Noncompete Exemption For Rare Disorder

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-082 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-082 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Governor Signed
2018-03-27 Sent to the Governor
2018-03-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-20SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-03-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2018-02-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-05SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-01-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-082
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_082_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_082_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_082_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_082_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_082_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_082_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-02-05t133207z-sb18-082-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-082vote5a4365
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-03-13t101703z-sb18-082-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-082vote5a70fb
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-082vote550b46
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-082vote551673

Bill Comments

feedback