CO SB082 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the regulation of methadone treatment facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation Of Methadone Treatment Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-082 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-082, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-082, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2017-04-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2017-04-20SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-19SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-04-12SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback