CO SB082 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County Workforce Development Prop Tax Incentives
Title
County Workforce Development Prop Tax Incentives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-082, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-082, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |