CO SB081 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Farm-to-school Interagency Task Force
Title
Farm-to-school Interagency Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-081 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-039, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-07 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-03-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-12 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-10 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-26 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |