CO SB079 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that certain practitioners prescribe controlled substances electronically.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Prescribing Controlled Substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08 Governor Signed
2019-03-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-19SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-13HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 03/15/2019 - No Amendments
2019-03-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
2019-02-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-06SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-04SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-079
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_079_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_079_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_079_rn3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_079_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_079_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_079_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8746401d13efe7e287258397007176bf-sb19-079-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8746401d13efe7e287258397007176bf-sb19-079-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-079vote5ef550
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bc555b8ac364deb0872583b5005ff4ec-sb19-079-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bc555b8ac364deb0872583b5005ff4ec-sb19-079-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-079vote55d484
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-079vote56a868
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-079vote5697c0

Bill Comments

feedback