CO SB078 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the responsibility of an individual firearm owner to report a missing firearm.
Title
Lost Or Stolen Firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.030) (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 24 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 26 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.017) (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 26 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.011) (Y: 29 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-078 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.030) (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 24 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 26 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.017) (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 26 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.011) (Y: 29 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-078 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |