CO SB078 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the protection of the open internet, and, in connection therewith, disqualifying an internet service provider from receiving high cost support mechanism money or other money received to finance broadband deployment if the internet service provider engages in certain practices that interfere with the open internet, requiring an internet service provider that engages in such practices to refund any such money received, and requiring a governmental body contracting for broadband internet access service to give preference to an internet service provider that certifies that it will not engage in practices that interfere with the open internet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Internet Customer Protections In Colorado

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.013) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 32 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-078 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Governor Signed
2019-04-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-01HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-03-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-11SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-078
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_078_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_078_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_078_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_078_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_078_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_078_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d95f97ba0c0f4b5b872583ae00714da4-sb19-078-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d95f97ba0c0f4b5b872583ae00714da4-sb19-078-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-078vote590589
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ec4856d5963ea164872583cb006b4adb-sb19-078-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-078vote5b5843
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-078vote5b7e0d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-078vote55ca8a

Bill Comments

feedback