CO SB078 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the property taxation of a residential storage condominium unit.
Title
Residential Storage Condo Unit Property Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-078 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 17-078 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 17-078 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-078, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |