CO SB075 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements for transportation network companies, and, in connection therewith, requiring transportation network companies to comply with transparency requirements and deactivation and suspension procedures and making an appropriation.
Title
Transportation Network Company Transparency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-075 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-075 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-075, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-075 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-075 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-075, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |