CO SB074 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transparency In Direct Pay Health Care Prices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transparency In Direct Pay Health Care Prices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-074 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-074 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-074, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-16HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2015-02-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2015-02-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-02-05SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D7CD565BC9DB793C87257DA200618803?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D7CD565BC9DB793C87257DA200618803/$FILE/074_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D7CD565BC9DB793C87257DA200618803/$FILE/074shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D7CD565BC9DB793C87257DA200618803/$FILE/074_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D7CD565BC9DB793C87257DA200618803/$FILE/074_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C1EE1E1690D0D16087257DE300794CEC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A91F19374BD3963987257DE3007947C4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5A4BEE8A2BA0551A87257DE300793FEA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/222AF609212E351987257DE300793D02
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/018ADE0A791C28F887257DE30078C332
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FA1A00DB0F8573A387257E0A006F55C3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/020B79ADFE084A3F87257E0A006ED621

Bill Comments

feedback