CO SB073 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-14)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning changing the statute of limitations applicable to civil actions alleging sexual misconduct for which the statute of limitations has not yet run as of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Action Statute Of Limitations Sexual Assault

Sponsors

Sen. Donald Coram [R]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Matt Soper [R]
Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. James Coleman [D]Sen. John Cooke [R]
Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]
Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]Sen. Chris Holbert [R]
Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Pete Lee [D]
Sen. Larry Liston [R]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]
Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Ray Scott [R]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Tammy Story [D]
Sen. Faith Winter [D]Sen. Rob Woodward [R]Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]Rep. Judith Amabile [D]
Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]
Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]Rep. Lindsey Daugherty [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]
Rep. Thomas Exum [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]Rep. Alec Garnett [D]Rep. Tim Geitner [R]
Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]Rep. Edith Hooton [D]
Rep. Dominique Jackson [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]
Rep. Susan Lontine [D]Rep. Michael Lynch [R]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]
Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]
Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]Rep. Kerry Tipper [D]
Rep. Donald Valdez [D]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Mary Young [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Rerefer (2nd) (Y: 14 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-073 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15 Governor Signed
2021-04-08 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-30SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-26HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2021-03-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-01SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-02-24SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-073
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_073_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_073_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_073_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_073_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_073_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_073_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB073_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB073_L.004.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb073_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb073_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-073vote5c128c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0cdb9a16612fdd26872586860071c1ec-sb21-073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/96f32beb01b79390872586a100799b14-sb21-073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-073vote5d2b45
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-073vote5c6648
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-073vote57cdef
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-073vote57de31

Bill Comments

feedback