CO SB073 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Nurse Home Visitor Program Admin

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse Home Visitor Program Admin

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-073 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-073 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-08 Governor Action - Signed
2010-05-03 Sent to the Governor
2010-04-30 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-04-30 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-04-16 House Third Reading Passed
2010-04-15 House Second Reading Passed
2010-04-12 House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-03-23 Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services
2010-03-22 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-03-19 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-09 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-03-05 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-02-17 Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2010-01-15 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A001795EDE03725872576AA007A5B7E?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A001795EDE03725872576AA007A5B7E/$FILE/073_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A001795EDE03725872576AA007A5B7E/$FILE/073sapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A001795EDE03725872576AA007A5B7E/$FILE/073_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A001795EDE03725872576AA007A5B7E/$FILE/073_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A001795EDE03725872576AA007A5B7E/$FILE/073_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A001795EDE03725872576AA007A5B7E/$FILE/073_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A001795EDE03725872576AA007A5B7E/$FILE/073_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4A1E084ED680F9E6872576CD0065E400
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A606A41DD3622283872576DD00510745
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CCAFEFB43C8E42CE87257703006E0F33

Bill Comments

feedback