CO SB072 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Colorado Seed Potato Act
Title
Colorado Seed Potato Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 09-10-072 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-072, to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 09-10-072 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-072, to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-05 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-26 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-17 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources + Appropriations |