CO SB069 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning license plates, and, in connection therewith, specifying that the license plates of a motor vehicle that is classified as Class C personal property expire upon the sale or transfer of the motor vehicle, authorizing the issuance of license plates in previously retired styles, and making an appropriation.
Title
License Plate Expiration On Change Of Ownership
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Priola [D] | Rep. David Ortiz [D] | Rep. Alex Valdez [D] | Sen. Faith Winter [D] |
Rep. Monica Duran [D] | Sen. Thomas Exum [D] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] | Rep. Edith Hooton [D] |
Rep. Susan Lontine [D] | Sen. Kyle Mullica [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-069 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-069 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-069 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-069 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-069 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-069 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-069, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |