CO SB068 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an authorization of state credit unions opening branches in other states.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Branches For State Credit Unions

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Governor Signed
2020-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-16HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-11HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2020-02-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-10SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-068
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_068_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_068_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_068_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_068_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_068_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_068_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9e4a758483357efa8725850a007199b2-sb20-068-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9e4a758483357efa8725850a007199b2-sb20-068-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-068vote5bb011
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4fc5c90a136e40fa87258528006cb787-sb20-068-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-068vote5c94ac

Bill Comments

feedback