CO SB066 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning high-cost special education grants awarded from a trust fund established for that purpose.
Title
High-cost Special Education Trust Fund Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-066 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-066 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |