CO SB065 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the disclosure of information related to the gasoline and special fuels tax.
Title
Gasoline And Special Fuels Tax Info Disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-21 | Governor Signed | |
2021-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |