CO SB065 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a limitation on the use of mobile electronic devices while driving, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limit Mobile Electronic Devices While Driving

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Postpone Senate Bill 20-065 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government + Judiciary
2020-02-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-25SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-11SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-065
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_065_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_065_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_065_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/782c1930541d01bf8725850b00783a30-sb20-065-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5388673efe1406708725851900548167-sb20-065-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5388673efe1406708725851900548167-sb20-065-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-065vote5f86e3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/782c1930541d01bf8725850b00783a30-sb20-065-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/782c1930541d01bf8725850b00783a30-sb20-065-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/782c1930541d01bf8725850b00783a30-sb20-065-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/782c1930541d01bf8725850b00783a30-sb20-065-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/18b8c564afbb8889872585750072b19e-sb20-065-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback