CO SB064 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the office of public guardianship.
Title
Continue Office Of Public Guardianship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-064 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-064 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reconsider (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-064 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-064 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reconsider (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |