CO SB063 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a strategic action plan to address infant and family child care home shortages in Colorado.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infant And Family Child Care Action Plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-063 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-063 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-063, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-063, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-063, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-063, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23 Governor Signed
2019-04-18 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
2019-02-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-12SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-08SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-24SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-063
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_063_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_063_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_063_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_063_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_063_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_063_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/677dc4e32f3d66bb8725838c0070c5e1-sb19-063-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/677dc4e32f3d66bb8725838c0070c5e1-sb19-063-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c70be0a5c2a6c5838725839b005562a7-sb19-063-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/08012070468527148725839b00530c7f-sb19-063-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-063vote58aa39
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/08012070468527148725839b00530c7f-sb19-063-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4c469567894e118c872583c5005b10d4-sb19-063-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/902e609b658305e6872583d7004e9ca6-sb19-063-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-063vote557fd5

Bill Comments

feedback